Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTORY OF STUFF PROJECT et al v. UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01358
Date Filed2017-07-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffSTORY OF STUFF PROJECT
PlaintiffCOURAGE CAMPAIGN INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Story of Stuff Project and the Courage Campaign Institute submitted FOIA requests to the FDA for records concerning Nestle and Arrowhead and their relationship to San Bernardino National Forest. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told the requesters that 11 other requests were in line for processing before theirs. After the agency did not respond to their requests, both the Story of Stuff Project and the Courage Campaign Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DefendantUNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ("FDA")
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-111COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5026705) filed by STORY OF STUFF PROJECT, COURAGE CAMPAIGN INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Civil Procees Clerk, # 3 Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Summons to Defendant)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-112Corporate Disclosure Statement by STORY OF STUFF PROJECT. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-113Corporate Disclosure Statement by COURAGE CAMPAIGN INSTITUTE. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-11Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-114SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-135GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/13/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/20/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/19/2017. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/20/2017. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-288RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 7/20/2017 (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-08-159Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-15MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 9/12/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/15/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-1510WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO 11 ..... MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) Modified on 8/16/2017 (zjf). (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-1511ERRATA by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff