Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBarton v. United States Department of Commerce, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
DistrictDistrict of Alaska
CityAnchorage
Case Number3:2017cv00155
Date Filed2017-07-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeTimothy M. Burgess
PlaintiffCody Barton
Case DescriptionCody Barton submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning the report of a federal fisheries observer who witnessed an onboard accident in which Barton was permanently disabled. The agency withheld most of the report under Exemption 3 (other statutes), citing Section 402(b)(2) of the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act, which provides for confidentiality of observer information. Barton filed an administrative appeal, which was denied. Barton then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 3

DefendantUnited States Department of Commerce, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-121COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against United States Department of Commerce, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (Filing fee $400/Receipt #05947G.), filed by Cody Barton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-122Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-123Unissued summons re Defendant United States Department of Commerce, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-12Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/13/2017 to reflect correct party(PXS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-134Unissued summons re Defendant United States Department of Commerce, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, (Attachments: # 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant US Attorney General)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-13Summons Issued as to United States Department of Commerce, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-205ORDER re Motion to Dismiss; parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 7/20/17. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-216CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cody Barton re 1 Complaint, Summons and Complaint Served. FOIA Answer due 8/14/2017 (Gray, Steven) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-217NOTICE Notice of Service of Order Re Motion to Dismiss by Cody Barton re 5 Order (Gray, Steven) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-258AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on U.S. Attorney General; NOAA on 07/21/2017, filed by Cody Barton. (Gray, Steven) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-08-029NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Markham on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Markham, Gerald) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-0810MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by United States Department of Commerce, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gray, Sara) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff