Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReyes v. United States Department of the Interior et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv01419
Date Filed2017-07-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Gonzalo P. Curiel
PlaintiffEmilio Reyes
Case DescriptionEmilio Reyes submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Indian Affairs for records concerning the agency's decision on the tribal affiliation of a named individual. The agency withheld 10 documents in part. Reyes then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior
DefendantBureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants, IFP Filed, filed by Emilio Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-1419-GPC-MDD. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(fth) (sjt). (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Reyes. (fth) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-173NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Bureau of Indian Affairs of case(s) 17cv1187; 17cv1188; 17cv1189; 17cv1190; 17cv1191; 17cv1192; 17cv1193; 17cv1194; 17cv1195; 17cv1196; 17cv1197; 17cv1417; 17cv1418; 17cv1419; 17cv1420 . (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) proposed lno prepared (dlg). (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-254NOTICE of Prior Dismissal in Identical Case by United States Department of the Interior (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) QC EMAIL - atty not associated with party (fth). (Entered: 07/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff