Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReyes v. United States Department of the Interior, Office of the Solicitor et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv01417
Date Filed2017-07-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Anthony J. Battaglia
PlaintiffEmilio Reyes
Case DescriptionEmilio Reyes submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Indian Affairs for records concerning an individual who was a deceased member of the San Pasqual tribe. Reyes alleged that the agency failed to process either request, although it did assign a tracking number to his third request. Reyes filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Reyes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior, Office of the Solicitor
DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs
DefendantRyan Zinke in his official capacity and as Secretary of the United States Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants, IFP Filed, filed by Emilio Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-1417-AJB-NLS. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(dsn) (sjt). (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Reyes. (dsn) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-173NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by United States Department of the Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs of case(s) 17cv1187; 17cv1188; 17cv1189; 17cv1190; 17cv1191; 17cv1192; 17cv1193; 17cv1194; 17cv1195; 17cv1196; 17cv1197; 17cv1417; 17cv1418; 17cv1419; 17cv1420 . (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca)(acc). LNO prepared on 7/26/2017 (jao). (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-244ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/24/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (acc) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-255Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Letter)(acc) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-08-076SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emilio Reyes. United States Department of the Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs, United States Department of the Interior, Office of the Solicitor served. (acc) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-147SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emilio Reyes. Ryan Zinke served. (acc) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff