Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReyes v. United States Department of Interior et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv01420
Date Filed2017-07-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Cathy Ann Bencivengo
PlaintiffEmilio Reyes
Case DescriptionEmilio Reyes submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Indian Affairs for records concerning 1928 California Indian blanket applications. The agency withheld 95 documents in full and 178 documents in part. Reyes then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior
DefendantBureau of Indian Affairs Pacific Regional Office
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants, IFP Filed, filed by Emilio Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-1420-CAB-WVG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(fth) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Reyes. (fth) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-143ORDER Denying 2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/14/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-174NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Bureau of Indian Affairs of case(s) 17cv1187; 17cv1188; 17cv1189; 17cv1190; 17cv1191; 17cv1192; 17cv1193; 17cv1194; 17cv1195; 17cv1196; 17cv1197; 17cv1417; 17cv1418; 17cv1419; 17cv1420 . (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) (jjg). LNO prepared on 7/26/2017 (jao). (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-255NOTICE of Prior Judgment in Identical Case by United States Department of the Interior (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) (jjg). (Entered: 07/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff