Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleColumbia Riverkeeper v. United States Department Of Energy
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2017cv01093
Date Filed2017-07-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Marco A. Hernandez
PlaintiffColumbia Riverkeeper a non-profit Washington corporation
DefendantUnited States Department Of Energy a United States agency
DefendantUnited States Department Of Energy
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-141Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5078201 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper against United States Department Of Energy (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Johnson, Miles) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-142Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Johnson, Miles) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-193Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 11/16/2017. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/18/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 12/18/2017. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (joha) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-194Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department Of Energy. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff