Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01424
Date Filed2017-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the agency's compliance efforts in response to a 2016 GAO report on unauthorized grazing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5035406) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons BLM, # 4 Summons AG, # 5 Summons USAO)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-18Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-192SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-203GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/20/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-254RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/24/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/23/2017. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-255RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/24/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 7/24/2017. (See Docket Entry 4 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-08-146NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-147Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-14MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 9/6/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/14/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-09-068ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-15MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 9/29/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/15/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-299Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-04MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 10/31/2017, which shall included a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/4/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-05MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 10/31/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/5/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-3110Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-02MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 12/12/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/2/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-12-04Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-1211Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-13MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 13, 2017. (JPF) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2018-02-0612Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 6, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/10/2018. (JK) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-04-1013Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-12MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' proposal in their 13 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 12, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-06-1114Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before August 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 19, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2018. (kh) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-08-1715Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-09-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Status Report and Proposed Schedule, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 10, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-2616Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 26, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-11-0517Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Status Report and Proposed Schedule, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another status report on or before December 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 6, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar