Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01426
Date Filed2017-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR")
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to the Privacy Office at the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning a July 3, 2014 meeting entitled CIR/Legal Authority. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5035869) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons for Defendant, # 4 Summons for U.S. Attorney)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-182LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-18Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-284RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/24/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/23/2017. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/24/2017. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/27/2017 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff