Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREYES v. UNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01497
Date Filed2017-07-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffFELICIANA G. REYES
Case DescriptionFeliciana Reyes submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning the Filipino Veterans Equity Compensation Fund. Reyes also requested expedited processing. NARA denied Reyes' request for expedited processing. Reyes filed an administrative appeal pertaining to the agency's failure to respond. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Reyes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-261COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5048152) filed by FELICIANA G. REYES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons to NARA, # 12 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 13 Summons to U.S. Attorney General)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-26Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (md) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-312ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR- KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/31/2017. (DM) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-313SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-014MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FELICIANA G. REYES (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Watkins Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Watkins Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Watkins Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Watkins Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Watkins Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Watkins Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Watkins Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Watkins Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 9 to Watkins Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 10 to Watkins Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 11 to Watkins Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 12 to Watkins Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 13 to Watkins Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 14 to Watkins Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 15 to Watkins Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 16 to Watkins Declaration)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-015NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-016NOTICE of Appearance by Louis S. Mastriani on behalf of FELICIANA G. REYES (Mastriani, Louis) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-027RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/1/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/31/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-02Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 8/4/2017 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-048RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 8/3/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-049RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/04/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-04MINUTE ORDER: On August 4, 2017, the Court held an on-the-record teleconference regarding Plaintiff's 4 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. During the call, Defendant proposed a schedule for processing and releasing materials in response to Plaintiff's FOIA request. The parties agreed to file a Joint Status Report memorializing that proposal by close of business on August 7, 2017. Furthermore, in light of this proposal, Plaintiff has agreed to hold its 4 Motion in abeyance, pursuant to the terms set forth in the Joint Status Report. Accordingly, following receipt of the Joint Status Report, the 4 Motion shall be held in ABEYANCE pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/4/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-04Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference on the record held on 8/4/2017. (Court Reporter Richard Ehrlich.) (dot) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-0710Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-0711CONSENT ORDER that Plaintiff's 4 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction shall be held in abeyance, until further order of the Court. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/7/17. (dot) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff