Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGARDEN STATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01511
Date Filed2017-07-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffGARDEN STATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case DescriptionThe Garden State Life Insurance Company submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning two alien file numbers related to Christaine Bossoma, a naturalized U.S. citizen who had died in the Ivory Coast in 2008 after her family had taken out a life insurance policy on her. The company supplied a copy of her death certificate, which it had received as part of litigation brought by her family to enforce the insurance policy. The agency disclosed 50 pages, but redacted identifying information about Bossoma's parents. The agency also told the company that the second alien file number did not relate to Bossoma. The company then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-271COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5049904) filed by GARDEN STATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USA, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons DHS, # 5 Summons USCIS)(Wright, Jason) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-272MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew J. Frisch, :Firm- The Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch, PLLC, :Address- 40 Fulton Street, 23rd Floor, New York, New York 10038. Phone No. - (212) 285-8000. Fax No. - (646) 304-0352 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5049936. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GARDEN STATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-273LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GARDEN STATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-27Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (md) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-02MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/2/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-024SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-175NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff