Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAlexander-Stokes v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2017cv04433
Date Filed2017-07-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Raymond J. Dearie
PlaintiffBenida Alexander-Stokes
Case DescriptionBenida Alexander-Stokes, the daughter of Bertram Alexander, a federal prisoner who died while incarcerated, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning her father's grievances and the agency's responses. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Alexander-Stokes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice including its component the Federal Bureau of Prisons,
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-271COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9713418 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Benida Alexander-Stokes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons) (Rankin, David) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-27Case assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-272Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-273In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-274This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-08-085SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benida Alexander-Stokes. United States Department of Justice served on 8/8/2017, answer due 8/29/2017. (Rankin, David) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff