Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKILMER v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01566
Date Filed2017-08-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffPAUL F. KILMER
Case DescriptionPaul Kilmer submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning whether individuals planning to attend the Women's March in Washington on January 21, 2017 from Canada were denied entrance to the United States. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Kilmer filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-021COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5058590) filed by PAUL F. KILMER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kilmer, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-02Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (md) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03SUMMONS (3) Not Issued as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (SUMMONS WERE NOT SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (zmd) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-042ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/04/2017. (DM) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-043ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by PAUL F. KILMER.(Kilmer, Paul) Modified on 8/7/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-07NOTICE OF ERROR re 3 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to paulkilmer@msn.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. ENTERED IN ERROR; Incorrect forms; Refile using correct summons, AO 440. (znmw, ) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-094REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by PAUL F. KILMER.(Kilmer, Paul) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-095SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff