Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJones v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of Ohio
CityAkron
Case Number5:2017cv01654
Date Filed2017-08-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John R. Adams
PlaintiffPaul R. Jones
Case DescriptionPaul Jones, who had been employed as a practical nurse at the VA medical center in Cleveland, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning himself while employed at the VA medical center in Cleveland. The FBI told Jones it had located 1,286 pages, of which 305 pages might be responsive. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Jones filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-071Complaint against Federal Bureau of Investigation. Filing fee not paid, IFP submitted, filed by Paul R. Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 4 - FBI Correspondence, # 3 Summons, # 4 U.S. Marshal Forms) (M,TL) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-07Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-07Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-072Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Paul R. Jones. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-09-133Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc # 2 ). Judge John R. Adams on 9/13/17.(K,C) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-13Copy of 3 Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Paul R. Jones at 321 Stanton Ave., Akron, OH 44301 on 9/14/17. Related document(s) 3 . (K,C) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-194Original Summons issued to the U.S. Marshal for service upon Federal Bureau of Investigation (also c/o U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General) on 9/16/2017. (M,TL) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff