Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2017-08-09 | 1 | COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5068198) filed by ALBERTO RODGRIGO GUTIERREZ FLEIG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Summons)(Rifkin, Larry) (Entered: 08/09/2017) |
2017-08-09 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sth) (Entered: 08/10/2017) |
2017-08-10 | 2 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/10/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/10/2017) |
2017-08-10 | 3 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(sth) Modified on 8/18/2017 (sth). (Entered: 08/10/2017) |
2017-08-18 | | SUMMONS Not Issued as to US Attorney and the US Attorney General. (sth) (Entered: 08/18/2017) |
2017-08-21 | 4 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Attorney General filed by ALBERTO RODGRIGO GUTIERREZ FLEIG. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Rifkin, Larry) (Entered: 08/21/2017) |
2017-08-22 | 5 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 08/22/2017) |
2017-09-26 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/26/2017) |
2017-10-30 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/30/2017) |
2017-11-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on November 28, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties shall confer in advance of the conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/2/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 11/02/2017) |
2017-11-03 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2017, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 11/03/2017) |
2017-11-13 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Anabel Diaz on behalf of ALBERTO RODGRIGO GUTIERREZ FLEIG (Diaz, Anabel) (Entered: 11/13/2017) |
2017-11-20 | 9 | Joint MOTION for Hearing (Telephonic) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/20/2017) |
2017-11-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Parties' Joint Motion for Telephonic Hearing 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for November 28, 2017, at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 21, shall take place telephonically. The Courtroom Deputy will call the parties at the time of the hearing. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/21/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 11/21/2017) |
2017-11-28 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/28/2017. Defendant to provide Vaughn Index to Plaintiff by 12/15/2017; Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 11/28/2017) |
2018-01-02 | 10 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 01/02/2018) |
2018-01-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before January 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/3/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/03/2018) |
2018-01-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2018. (kt) (Entered: 01/03/2018) |
2018-01-19 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 01/19/2018) |
2018-01-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before February 21, 2018; (2) Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before March 23, 2018; and (3) Defendant shall file its reply to Plaintiff's response on or before April 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/22/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/22/2018) |
2018-01-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before 2/21/2018; Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before 3/23/2018; Defendant shall file its reply to Plaintiff's response on or before 4/13/2018. (kt) (Entered: 01/23/2018) |
2018-02-20 | 12 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 02/20/2018) |
2018-02-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and Defendant shall file its dispositive motion on or before March 23, 2018. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before April 22, 2018; and Defendant shall file its reply to Plaintiff's response on or before May 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/21/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 02/21/2018) |
2018-02-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its dispositive motion on or before 3/23/2018; Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before 4/22/2018; Defendant shall file its reply to Plaintiff's response on or before 5/13/2018. (kt) (Entered: 02/21/2018) |
2018-03-23 | 13 | MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13)(Rogers, Joshua). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 3/26/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/23/2018) |
2018-03-23 | 14 | ERRATA by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE 13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/23/2018) |
2018-04-20 | 15 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALBERTO RODGRIGO GUTIERREZ FLEIG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rifkin, Larry) (Entered: 04/20/2018) |
2018-04-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Extension of Time 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss, or, in the alternative, for summary judgment on or before May 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/20/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/20/2018) |
2018-04-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss, or, in the alternative, for summary judgment due on or before 5/22/2018. (kt) (Entered: 04/23/2018) |
2018-05-22 | 16 | RESPONSE re 13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALBERTO RODGRIGO GUTIERREZ FLEIG. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Not in Dispute, # 2 Statement of Facts In Dispute, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rifkin, Larry) (Entered: 05/22/2018) |
2018-05-30 | 17 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/30/2018) |
2018-06-14 | 18 | RESPONSE re 17 Reply to opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by ALBERTO RODGRIGO GUTIERREZ FLEIG. (Rifkin, Larry) (Entered: 06/14/2018) |
2018-10-19 | 19 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ALBERTO RODGRIGO GUTIERREZ FLEIG (Rifkin, Larry) (Entered: 10/19/2018) |
Hide Docket Events |