Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUrban v. Adult Protective Services
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv06035
Date Filed2017-08-10
Date Closed2017-08-11
JudgeJudge William H. Pauley, III
PlaintiffRalph Urban
Case DescriptionRalph Urban submitted a request to the City of New York Law Department under the New York Freedom of Information Law. The department told Urban it could find no records. Urban then filed suit under the federal FOIA. While Urban may have a claim under the New York FOIL, he does not have a claim under the federal FOIA.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantAdult Protective Services (APS) a subdivision of the Human Resources Administration , of the City of New York, a municipal corp. et al
AppealSecond Circuit 17-2821
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-101COMPLAINT against Adult Protective Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401187495)Document filed by Ralph Urban.(pc) (pc). (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-102CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) (pc). (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-10SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adult Protective Services. (pc) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-10Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-10Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-113ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record on August 11, 2017, Plaintiff's application for a temporary restraining order is denied and this case is dismissed without prejudice on consent of the parties. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and mark this case as closed. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 8/11/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-114MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION(Based upon New Evidence); re: 3 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Ralph Urban.(sc) Modified on 8/14/2017 (sc). (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-115NOTICE OF (Ex Parte) MOTION FOR ORDER OF PROTECTION. Document filed by Ralph Urban.(sc) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff