Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTATE OF CALIFORNIA v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01626
Date Filed2017-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffSTATE OF CALIFORNIA
Case DescriptionThe State of California submitted FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning the process the agency has taken to ensure that Administrator Scott Pruitt is in compliance with federal ethics regulations and obligations and the agency's policies and procedures for determining who (if anyone) can assume the powers of the Administrator if Pruitt is disqualified from participating in a matter. The State also requested a fee waiver for some of its requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, granted a fee waiver for some requests, and indicated that it was processing them. After hearing nothing further from the agency, California filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-111COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5070969) filed by STATE OF CALIFORNIA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-11Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-142SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-14SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (FOIA SUMMONS WERE NOT SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-143REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney General re 1 Complaint filed by STATE OF CALIFORNIA. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by STATE OF CALIFORNIA.(Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-144REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney for District of Columbia re 1 Complaint filed by STATE OF CALIFORNIA. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by STATE OF CALIFORNIA.(Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-155SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (nmw) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/22/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/21/2017. (Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-307RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/22/2017. (Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-308RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 8/21/2017 (Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff