Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWITTES v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01627
Date Filed2017-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffBENJAMIN WITTES
Case DescriptionBenjamin Wittes, editor of an online legal publication, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning information about the country of origin of individuals convicted of terrorism-related offenses. Wittes submitted a second FOIA request to Justice for information supporting President Trump's claim in his State of the Union address that the vast majority of individuals convicted of terrorism-related offenses came from outside the U.S. Wittes asked for a fee waiver for both requests. The Office of Information Policy consolidated the two requests and invoked unusual circumstances. Wittes submitted two FOIA requests to the National Security Division of DOJ for the same information. Wittes also submitted a FOIA request to OMB for information about Trump's claim that the majority of those individuals convicted for terrorism-related offenses came from outside the U.S. All the agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Wittes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-111COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5071293) filed by BENJAMIN WITTES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F, # 7 Exhibit Ex. G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons Attorney General, # 10 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 11 Summons OMB, # 12 Summons DOJ)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-11Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (md) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-142SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-09-083RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/28/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/27/2017. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/28/2017. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 8/28/2017; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/28/2017 (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff