Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELLIOTT v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01477
Date Filed2017-07-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffDAMON ELLIOTT
Case DescriptionDamon Elliott, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning the description contained in the National Register of Historic Places of two specified buildings. The agency failed to respond and Elliott filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-17Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/17/2017. (md) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-07-171COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY with Jury Demand filed by DAMON ELLIOTT. (md) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2017: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (md). (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-07-172MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAMON ELLIOTT. (md) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-07-173PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DAMON ELLIOTT. (md) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-184ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; It is hereby ORDERED that, within 30 days of entry of this Order, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why his application to proceed in forma pauperis should not be denied under rule 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). If plaintiff fails to file a timely response to this Order, the Court will deny his application to proceed in forma pauperis and dismiss this civil action without prejudice. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/14/17. (zmd) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-09-055RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 4 Order to Show Cause, filed by DAMON ELLIOTT. (md) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff