Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRICHARDSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01557
Date Filed2017-07-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffHENRY P. RICHARDSON
Case DescriptionHenry Richardson, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning policies and procedures for the U.S. Attorney's Office in Richmond. He also requested records about himself. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Richardson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-31Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/31/2017. (zsb) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-07-311COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by HENRY P. RICHARDSON. (Attachment: # 1 Attachment A)(zsb) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-282PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/17/2017. (zmd) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff