Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZhirovetskiy v. Zayo Group, LLC
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2017cv05876
Date Filed2017-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Sharon Johnson Coleman
PlaintiffDenis Zhirovetskiy Individually and on behalf of similarly situated individuals
DefendantZayo Group, LLC a Delaware limited liability company
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-111NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2017CH 09323) filed by Zayo Group, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13470292. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Strubbe, Joseph) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-112CIVIL Cover Sheet (Strubbe, Joseph) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-113ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Zayo Group, LLC by Joseph A. Strubbe (Strubbe, Joseph) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-114ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Zayo Group, LLC by Frederic T. Knape (Knape, Frederic) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-11CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (meg, ) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-145NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, ) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-146MOTION by Defendant Zayo Group, LLC for extension of time to file answer (AGREED) (Strubbe, Joseph) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-147NOTICE of Motion by Joseph A. Strubbe for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 6 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/22/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Strubbe, Joseph) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-148EMAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (ph, ) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-219MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's agreed motion for extension of time 6 is granted. Responsive pleading is due 9/18/2017. No further extensions will be permitted. The parties are reminded that responsive pleadings must comply with section A(3) of this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. No appearance necessary on 8/22/2017. Status hearing set for 9/29/2017 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice (rth) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-09-1810MOTION by Defendant Zayo Group, LLC To Dismiss or, Alternatively, To Strike (Strubbe, Joseph) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-1811MEMORANDUM by Zayo Group, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 10 (Attachments: # 1 Group Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Strubbe, Joseph) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-1812NOTICE of Motion by Joseph A. Strubbe for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 10 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/26/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Strubbe, Joseph) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-1813ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Zayo Group, LLC(Strubbe, Joseph) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff