Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHawkins v. Hawley et al
DistrictWestern District of Missouri
CityJefferson City
Case Number2:2017cv04159
Date Filed2017-08-21
Date Closed2017-08-25
JudgeDistrict Judge Brian C. Wimes
PlaintiffBroderick K Hawkins
Case DescriptionBroderick Hawkins, a state prisoner, requested records from the state attorney's office. When his request was denied, Hawkins filed suit against Josh Hawley, an attorney in the Missouri Attorney General's Office. This is not a FOIA request since Hawley does not work for a federal agency.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantJosh Hawley MO Attorney General
DefendantDaniel Green Cole County Circuit Court Judge
DefendantUSA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-211COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Broderick K Hawkins. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits)(Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-212IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT declaration filed by Broderick K Hawkins. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-234ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a); (2) plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defects in this complaint on or before September 13, 2017; (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail plaintiff a copy of this Order along with in forma pauperis forms; and (4) FAILURE OF PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER WILL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF. Signed on August 23, 2017 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (CLERK'S NOTE: In forma pauperis forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-255ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) the agency having custody of the Plaintiff forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid; and (3) this case is dismissed pursuant to § 1915A(b)(1). Signed on August 25, 2017 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Richard, Tracey) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-256CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) the agency having custody of the Plaintiff forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid; and (3) this case is dismissed pursuant to § 1915A(b)(1). (Richard, Tracey) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-287Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Broderick K Hawkins. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-018PLAINTIFF'S LETTER to the Court from Broderick K. Hawkins. (Richard, Tracey) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff