Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleExxon Mobil Corporation v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2017cv02318
Date Filed2017-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge David C Godbey
PlaintiffExxon Mobil Corporation
Case DescriptionExxon Mobil submitted several FOIA requests to the IRS for records concerning the agency's administrative audit of the company's taxes from 2006 �" 2011. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Exxon Mobil filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-311COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8640406) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Katz, William) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-312NOTICE of Related Case (No. 3:16-cv-2921-N) re: 1 Complaint filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Katz, William) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-313CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Katz, William) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-314Request for Clerk to issue Summons upon United States of America by service upon John A. Koskinen, Commissioner, Internal Revenue Service filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Katz, William) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-315Request for Clerk to issue Summons upon United States of America by service upon Jeff Sessions, Attorney General of the United States filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Katz, William) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-316Request for Clerk to issue Summons upon United States of America by service upon Civil Process Clerk, United States Attorney filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Katz, William) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-317New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-318Summons issued as to Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ykp) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-019RESPONSE filed by Internal Revenue Service re: 2 Notice (Other) (Hagerman, Richard) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-0510TRANSFER ORDER: This civil action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the docket of United States District Judge David Godbey. Going forward, this case will be designated by the letter suffix "N," rather than the letter suffix "M." (ash) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/5/2017) (ash) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-1511NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Reinhart on behalf of Internal Revenue Service. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Reinhart, Katherine) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff