Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFIGLEY v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01789
Date Filed2017-09-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffPAUL F. FIGLEY
Case DescriptionPaul Figley, a law professor at American University, submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the "Stop Settlements Slush Fund Act of 2016" (H.R. 732). The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Figley that it found no responsive records. Figley filed an administrative appeal of the no records response. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Figley filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-011COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5099279) filed by PAUL F. FIGLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Madden, Jerome) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-01Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sb) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-01SUMMONS Not Issued as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General.....SUMMONS NOT FILED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED. (sb) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-012REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE EPA filed by PAUL F. FIGLEY.(Madden, Jerome) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-013REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Attorney General filed by PAUL F. FIGLEY.(Madden, Jerome) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-014REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Attorney, District of Columbia filed by PAUL F. FIGLEY.(Madden, Jerome) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-105REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Attorney, District of Columbia filed by PAUL F. FIGLEY.(Madden, Jerome) (Entered: 09/10/2017)
2017-09-116SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff