Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePEJOUHESH v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01768
Date Filed2017-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffHASSAN ALI PEJOUHESH
Case DescriptionHassan Ali Pejouhesh, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Postal Service for records concerning an investigation by the U.S. Postal Inspection Service that resulted in Pejouhesh's conviction. The agency disclosed 23 pages with redactions made under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). The agency also told Pejouhesh that it had destroyed some records responsive to his request. Pejouhesh ultimately filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search

DefendantUNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-171COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service, filed by Hassan Ali Pejouhesh. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Envelope)(kns, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/31/2017.] (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-252ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/25/2017. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 8/25/17) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/31/2017.] (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-313Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:17-cv-02365. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/31/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff