Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01828
Date Filed2017-09-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffBACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED
PlaintiffBACARDI U.S.A., INC.
Case DescriptionBacardi & Company submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Foreign Assets Control at the Department of Treasury for records concerning an OFAC license granted to Cubaexport, an entity controlled by the Cuban government. The agency disclosed 32 pages in an initial release. Bacardi & Company filed an administrative appeal, which was rejected as being premature. Bacardi & Company then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-061COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5104940) filed by BACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED, BACARDI U.S.A., INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-062REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Office of Foreign Assets Control, U.S. Department of the Treasury filed by BACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED, BACARDI U.S.A., INC..(Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-063REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Department of the Treasury filed by BACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED, BACARDI U.S.A., INC..(Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-064REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney General filed by BACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED, BACARDI U.S.A., INC..(Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-065REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia filed by BACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED, BACARDI U.S.A., INC..(Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-066REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia (corrected) filed by BACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED, BACARDI U.S.A., INC..(Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-077ERRATA COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by BACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED, BACARDI U.S.A., INC. 1 Complaint, filed by BACARDI U.S.A., INC., BACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED. (Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-07Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-078SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-119ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/11/2017. (DM) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1310Corporate Disclosure Statement by BACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED, BACARDI U.S.A., INC.. (Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-1311MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael C. Lynch, :Firm- Kelley Drye & Warren, :Address- 101 Park Avenue, New York, NY 10178. Phone No. - 212-808-7800. Fax No. - 212-8087897 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by BACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED, BACARDI U.S.A., INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Michael C. Lynch, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-1312MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Damon W. Suden, :Firm- Kelley Drye & Warren, :Address- 101 Park Avenue, New York, NY 10178. Phone No. - 212-808-7800. Fax No. - 212-808-7897 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by BACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED, BACARDI U.S.A., INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Damon W. Suden, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-2213RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/18/2017. (Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-2214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/18/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/18/2017. (Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-2215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 9/18/2017 (Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-2216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL served on 9/18/2017 (Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-26Filing fees: $ 100.00, receipt number 4616087319 and 4616087320 $100.00 for the Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice docket entry numbers 11 and 12 . (td) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2617NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-10-1318MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, which seeks a 21-day extension of time for Defendant to respond to the complaint. Plaintiff consents to a 7-day extension, but not to a 21-day extension. For good cause shown, a 7-day extension is GRANTED, and Defendant's response to the complaint is due by OCTOBER 25, 2017. Plaintiff shall file a response by October 18, 2017 stating the factual and legal basis for its opposition. If no response is received by that date, the extension shall be automatically enlarged to 21-days, and Defendant's response to the complaint shall be due by NOVEMBER 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/16/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-1619RESPONSE re 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond / PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND filed by BACARDI & COMPANY LIMITED, BACARDI U.S.A., INC.. (Robeck, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff