Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCampbell v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityPhoenix Division
Case Number2:2017cv03061
Date Filed2017-09-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge David G Campbell
PlaintiffKatie Elaine Campbell
Case DescriptionKatie Campbell submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records on the status of convicted criminals in Arizona who cannot be deported under the 2001 Supreme Court ruling in Zadvydas v. Davis. The agency found a spreadsheet responsive to Campbell's request but redacted identifying information under Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Campbell filed an administrative appeal, which was upheld by the agency. Campbell then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-081COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14631445 filed by Katie Elaine Campbell. (Submitted by Katherine May) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAS) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-082SUMMONS Submitted by Katie Elaine Campbell. (Submitted by Katherine May)(KAS) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-083Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14631445. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-3061-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAS) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-114SUMMONS Submitted by Katie Elaine Campbell. (May, Katherine) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-115ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/11/2017. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-126Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-277SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Katie Elaine Campbell: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint; Exhibits A-D; and Civil Cover Sheet upon United States Department of Homeland Security on September 15, 2017. (May, Katherine) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff