Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJason Wayne Naillieux v. United States of America
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2017cv06621
Date Filed2017-09-08
Date Closed2017-09-22
JudgeJudge Andre Birotte Jr
PlaintiffJason Wayne Naillieux
Case DescriptionJason Naillieux filed suit against the United States to force the District Attorney's Office in Los Angeles to disclose records. He then filed suit alleging a number of vague constitutional claims. This is not a FOIA suit.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantUnited States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-081COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jason Wayne Naillieux against Defendant United States of America. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Request, # 2 CV-71) (jtil) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-082CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jason Wayne Naillieux. (jtil) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-083REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jason Wayne Naillieux. (jtil) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-084NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-085NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-136STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-13RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support 3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval. (bem) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-227ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Denying 3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Reasons: District Court lacks jurisdiction. Legally and/or factually patently frivolous. See document for further details. ( MD JS-6, Case Terminated. ) (gk) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff