Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJACKSON v. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2016cv05253
Date Filed2016-10-05
Date Closed2017-07-26
JudgeHONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE
PlaintiffMARK JACKSON
DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 148036.), filed by MARK JACKSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheets)(tj, ) Modified on 10/7/2016 (tjd). (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/18/2016) (tjd, ). (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-10-05Summons 3 Issued; 2 Given to Pro Se and and 1 Forwarded to the U.S. Attorney's Office as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (tj, ) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-10-122Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kp, ) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-233AFFIDAVIT of Service by Process Server Sarah J. Emerson re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by CERTIFIED MAIL. (kp, ) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-12-124ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(DAVID, GREGORY) Modified on 12/14/2016 (tjd). (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-215ORDER THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/5/2017 AT 03:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/21/2016. 12/22/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-236REPORT OF RULE 26(f) MEETING by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(DAVID, GREGORY) Modified on 12/28/2016 (afm, ). (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2016-12-297REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Response to Defendants' Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting filed by MARK A. JACKSON. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(kp, ) Modified on 12/30/2016 (tjd). (Entered: 12/29/2016)
2017-01-068SCHEDULING ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 2/13/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN JUDGES CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. THE LAST DAY TO JOIN PARTIES WITHOUT LEAVE OF COURT IS 1/6/2017. DEFENDANTS' DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 2/6/2017. PLAINTIFF'S DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 2/27/2017. FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 1/6/2017. 1/6/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-02-069MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.Memorandum, Declarations, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Certificate of Service)(DAVID, GREGORY) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-1410Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS Settlement Conference held on 2/13/2017. (kp, ) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-1711MOTION For An Extension Of Time To File A Response To Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment And To File Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by MARK JACKSON. Certificate of Service. (aeg) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-2112ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S 11 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED IN PART. PLAINTIFF WILL FILE ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON OR BEFORE 3/13/2017, AND RESPOND TO ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS FILED BY DEFENDANT BY 3/13/2017. DEFENDANTS WILL RESPOND TO ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON OR BEFORE 4/3/2017.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/17/2017.2/21/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(kp, ) Modified on 2/22/2017 (tjd). (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-22Set/Reset Deadlines as to 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment . RESPONSES DUE BY 3/13/2017. (kp, ) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-0713MOTION to Amend/Correct 4 Answer to Complaint, and to Substitute Amended Declarations filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.Declarations, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A Part 1, # 3 Exhibit A Part 2, # 4 Exhibit A Part 3, # 5 Exhibit A Part 4, # 6 Exhibit A Part 5, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Certificate of Service)(DAVID, GREGORY) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-0714ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' 13 MOTION TO AMEND/CORRECT THEIR ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT AND TO SUBSTITUTE AMENDED DECLARATIONS IS GRANTED. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO TO DOCKET THE AMENDED ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED LEAVE IS GRANTED FOR DEFENDANTS TO SUBSTITUTE THE DECLARATIONS SUBMITTED WITH THE AMENDED DECLARATIONS ATTACHED AT EXHIBIT C.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/7/2017.3/8/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) Modified on 3/8/2017 (kp, ). (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-0715AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(kp, ) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-0816MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by MARK JACKSON.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(kp, ) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-0917ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF WILL FILE ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND RESPOND TO ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS FILED BY DEFENDANT ON OR BEFORE 3/31/2017. DEFENDANTS WILL RESPOND TO ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ON OR BEFORE 4/21/2017.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/9/2017.3/10/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-3118DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by MARK JACKSON. MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Certificate of Service) (kp, ) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-1119MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(DAVID, GREGORY) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-1120ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION ARE DUE BY 5/1/2017.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/11/2017. 4/11/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-05-0121REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Certificate of Service)(DAVID, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-1122PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MARK JACKSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(kp, ) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-07-2623MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/25/2017. 7/26/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-2624ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/25/2017. 7/26/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-08-2225NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 24 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion) by MARK JACKSON. Filing fee paid$ 505, receipt number 164522. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-2326NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 25 Notice of Appeal filed by MARK JACKSON. USCA Case Number 17-2847. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff