Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMackenzie v. Clayton et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Jose
Case Number5:2017cv05244
Date Filed2017-09-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd
PlaintiffDouglas Evan Mackenzie
Case DescriptionDouglas MacKenzie, a public researcher, submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records sent to the 9/11/ Commission by the SEC. The agency denied MacKenzie's request on the basis of Exemption 5 (privileges). MacKenzie filed an administrative appeal. The agency disclosed portions of a memorandum entitled "Pre-September 11, 2001 Trading Review," but continued to withhold most records under Exemption 5 and a variety of other exemptions. MacKenzie asked for the rest of the appendices for the Trade Review memorandum. The agency declined to release any further records and MacKenzie filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantJay Clayton Chairman
DefendantSecurities and Exchange Commission
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-111COMPLAINT against Jay Clayton, Securities and Exchange Commission. No process. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Douglas Mackenzie. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-112MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Douglas Mackenzie. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-113Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-124ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-135Summons Issued as to Jay Clayton, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 USM-285) - Along with Consent or Declination(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-156Receipt of acknowledgment from U. S. Marshal Service (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-227MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Douglas Mackenzie. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-228Proposed Order re 7 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Douglas Mackenzie. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-259ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 7 plaintiff's Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-2510CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 9 Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-2512CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Douglas Mackenzie.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-0211SUMMONS Returned Executed Jay Clayton served on 9/29/2017, answer due 10/20/2017. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-1113JOINT MOTION to Stay Case filed by Jay Clayton, Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 10/25/2017. Replies due by 11/1/2017. (Tallarico, Mark) (Filed on 10/11/2017) Modified text on 10/12/2017 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-1214ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 13 Joint Motion to Stay Case. Case stayed until 1/12/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff