Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSARTORI v. UNITED STATES ARMY
DistrictNorthern District of Florida
CityPensacola
Case Number3:2017cv00679
Date Filed2017-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeCHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS
PlaintiffJASON SARTORI
Case DescriptionJason Satori, a major in the U.S. Army, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Army for records about himself to help defend him against charges that might lead to his dismissal from the Army. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Satori filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [42]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ARMY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-3973549.), filed by JASON SARTORI. (STANSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-142DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." (sdw) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-153CIVIL COVER SHEET. (STANSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-154NOTICE Summons by JASON SARTORI (STANSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-155NOTICE Summons by JASON SARTORI (STANSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-186Summons Issued as to US Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Department of Justice) (sdw) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-10-197NOTICE of Appearance by LEAH ANN BUTLER on behalf of UNITED STATES ARMY (BUTLER, LEAH) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-198Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES ARMY. (BUTLER, LEAH) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-19ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 8 Answer to Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-209INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/3/2017 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/4/2017 . Discovery due by 3/19/2018 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/20/2017. (sdw) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-11-2910REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (STANSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-29ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-1511ORDER. The deadlines in the Court's Initial Scheduling Order are tolled pending further order of the Court. The parties are directed to file a status report on or before February 15, 2018, advising the Court of the status of their negotiations to resolve Plaintiff's objections. Plaintiff will be allowed until February 15, 2018 to amend the Complaint. (Deadline for Status Report/Amend complaint by 2/15/2018 .) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/15/2017. (sdw) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2018-02-0212NOTICE UNAVAILABILITY FOR MILITARY SERVICE by JASON SARTORI (STANSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-02ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 12 NOTICE UNAVAILABILITY FOR MILITARY SERVICE. (sdw) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-0513FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ARMY, filed by JASON SARTORI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Amended Complaint) (STANSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-1514STATUS REPORT (Joint Report) by Jason Sartori and by UNITED STATES ARMY. (BUTLER, LEAH) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-15ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 14 Status Report, 13 Amended Complaint. (sdw) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1615ORDER granting 14 Status Report - Request for Extension of Time. The deadlines in the Court's Initial Scheduling Order will continue to toll until further order of the Court. The parties are directed to file a status report on or before 4/18/2018 , advising the Court of the status of their negotiations to resolve Plaintiff's objections. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/16/2018. (djb) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-04-1716STATUS REPORT by JASON SARTORI. (STANSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-18ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 16 Status Report. (sdw) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-1817ORDER. The Court will continue to toll all deadlines until May 21, 2018, at which time the parties must file a status report, advising the Court as to the negotiation and providing the Court with a proposed summary judgment briefing schedule. (Status Report due by 5/21/2018 .) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/18/2018. (sdw) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-1918Defendant's ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES ARMY. (BUTLER, LEAH) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-05-2119STATUS REPORT of Parties by UNITED STATES ARMY. (BUTLER, LEAH) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 19 STATUS REPORT of Parties. (sdw) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2220ORDER re 19 Status Report. The relief requested is GRANTED. The deadlines in the Court's Initial Scheduling Order will continue to toll until May 29, 2018. On or before that date, the parties must file a status report advising the Court of the status of their negotiations and, if applicable, providing a proposed summary judgment briefing schedule. (Status Report due by 5/29/2018 .) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/22/2018. (sdw) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-2921STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES ARMY. (BUTLER, LEAH) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-29ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 21 Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule (djb) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-2922ORDER - The 21 Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. The discovery deadlines in the Courts 9 Initial Scheduling Order are hereby vacated. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before 7/13/2018 . Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before 8/27/2018 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/29/2018. (djb) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-1823Consent MOTION PRODUCTION OF A VAUGHN INDEX by JASON SARTORI. (STANSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-18ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: 23 Consent MOTION PRODUCTION OF A VAUGHN INDEX . Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (sdw) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-2024ORDER. Defendant must file a response to Plaintiff's motion (ECF No. 23 ) on or before JUNE 28, 2018. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 06/20/2018. (Response to motion due by 6/28/2018 .) (MB) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-2625RESPONSE to Motion re 23 Consent MOTION PRODUCTION OF A VAUGHN INDEX filed by UNITED STATES ARMY. (BUTLER, LEAH) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-26ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re: 25 Response to Motion. (sdw) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-2626ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Production of a Vaughn Index (ECF No. 23 ) is GRANTED. The Government shall produce the index on or before July 13, 2018. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 6/26/2018. (sdw) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-1327MOTION to Extend Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and a Vaughn Index by UNITED STATES ARMY. (BUTLER, LEAH) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-16ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 27 MOTION to Extend Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and a Vaughn Index (djb) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-1628ORDER granting 27 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and a Vaughn Index. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/16/2018. (Summary Judgment Motion to be filed by 7/23/2018 .) (djb) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-2329MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by UNITED STATES ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss with Exhibits) (BUTLER, LEAH) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2330MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNTS ONE-THREE and MOTION TO DISMISS AS TO COUNTS FOUR-FIVE by UNITED STATES ARMY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 8/13/2018) . (sdw) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-23ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 29 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (sdw) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2431ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The word limit for Defendant's memorandum is increased as requested, not to exceed 12,923 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/24/2018. (sdw) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-08-0132Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JASON SARTORI. (STANSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-01ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment (djb) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-0133ORDER granting 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 3, 2018 to Respond to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/1/18. (mjm) (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/3/2018) .) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-09-0134MOTION to Stay re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment , MOTION to Compel by JASON SARTORI. (STANSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/01/2018)
2018-09-01Set Deadlines re 34 MOTION to Stay. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/17/2018 .) (sdw) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-1735MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 34 MOTION to Stay re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Compel by UNITED STATES ARMY. (BUTLER, LEAH) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-17ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. (sdw) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-1736ORDER granting 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. (Response due by 10/1/2018 .) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/17/2018. (sdw) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-10-0137REPLY to Response to Motion re 34 MOTION to Stay re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Compel filed by UNITED STATES ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4) (BUTLER, LEAH) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-01ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 37 Reply. (sdw) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-11-0838ORDER - Plaintiff's 34 MOTION to Stay his response to the 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 34 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and the Court DEFERS ruling on Plaintiff's response as to Count II. Plaintiff's 34 MOTION to Compel together with Defendant's 37 Response to the motion to compel is referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Timothy for further proceedings. If the motion to compel is denied, Plaintiffs response to the pending summary judgment motion is due within 14 days after the Chief Magistrate Judge's order denying the motion. If the motion is granted, the Clerk is directed to refer the case back to the undersigned for the purpose of establishing a response date. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/8/2018. Motions referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (djb) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-08ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: 34 MOTION to Compel, 37 Response to Motion. Re: 38 Order Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (djb) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-1439AMENDED ORDER. The Court reassigns this matter to Recalled Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier for resolution of the pending motion to compel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/14/2018. (sdw) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2019-01-1040ORDER Denying 34 MOTION to Compel filed by Pltf JASON SARTORI. The Court finds that Deft provided a legally sufficient Vaughn index. The Court defers from addressing the remaining raised issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N Frazier on 1/10/19. (mjm) (Pursuant to 38 Order, Internal deadline for referral to judge if Pltf's response to 30 Motion for Summary Judgment not filed earlier: 1/24/2019) .) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-2441RESPONSE by JASON SARTORI re 40 Order,, Set Deadlines, . (STANSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-24ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 41 Objection. (sdw) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-03-0942ORDER. The Rule 72(a) Objection, ECF No. 41 , is SUSTAINED. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I-III and to Dismiss as to Count IV, see ECF No. 30 , is DENIED without prejudice with leave to refile within 45 days together with a Vaughn index consistent with this Order. Count V of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. Plaintiff has 14 days after Defendant refiles its motion for summary judgment to file a response. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 03/09/2019. (Hay, Eugene) Modified on 3/11/2019 to edit docket text (sdw). (Entered: 03/09/2019)
2019-03-09Set Deadlines re 42 Order. Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/23/2019 . Response to Motion due by 5/7/2019 . (sdw) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar