Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGerrodette v. Bureau of Land Management et al
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityTucson Division
Case Number4:2017cv00477
Date Filed2017-09-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rosemary Marquez
PlaintiffPatricia Gerrodette
Case DescriptionPatricia Gerrodette submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the Cochise Conservation and Recharge Network. After hearing nothing from the agency, Gerrodette filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Gerrodette filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBureau of Land Management
DefendantUnited States Department of Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-251COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14685375 filed by Patricia Gerrodette. (Tuell, Cynthia) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SIB) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-252SUMMONS Submitted by Patricia Gerrodette. (Tuell, Cynthia) (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(SIB) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-253Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14685375. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Rosemary Marquez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:17-CV-00477-TUC-RM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SIB) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-254NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SIB) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-255Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(SIB). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-296MINUTE ORDER: Doc. 4 entered in error. This case is exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-047SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Patricia Gerrodette: Proof of Service re: Proof of Service upon Bureau of Land Management on 10/02/2017. (Tuell, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-048SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Patricia Gerrodette: Proof of Service re: Proof of Service upon Department of the Interior on 10/2/2017. (Tuell, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-049SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Patricia Gerrodette: Proof of Service re: Proof of Service upon Civil Process Clerk on 09/28/2017. (Tuell, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-0410SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Patricia Gerrodette: Proof of Service re: Proof of Service upon U.S. Attorney General on 10/2/2017. (Tuell, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff