Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKREMERS URBAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. v. UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01998
Date Filed2017-09-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffKREMERS URBAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Case DescriptionKremers Urban Pharmaceuticals submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records following up on events that had happened since Kremers' November 2016 request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Kremers Urban Pharmaceuticals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-271COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5134959) filed by KREMERS URBAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Boone, Brian) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-272LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KREMERS URBAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Boone, Brian) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-273NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by KREMERS URBAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:17-cv-50. (Boone, Brian) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-274NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Boone on behalf of KREMERS URBAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Boone, Brian) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-28Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-09-285SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/2/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/1/2017. (Boone, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-047RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 10/2/2017 (Boone, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-048RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/2/2017. (Boone, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff