Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAQUALLIANCE v. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02108
Date Filed2017-10-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAQUALLIANCE a Not-for-Profit Corporation
Case DescriptionAqualliance, a non-profit dedicated to defending northern California waters, submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning water quality downstream from the Orville Dam since January 2017. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Aqualliance filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantNATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-111COMPLAINT against NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5154373) filed by AQUALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to US Attorney Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Summons to Defendant)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-12Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-123Corporate Disclosure Statement by AQUALLIANCE. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/17/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/16/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/18/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/17/17. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/18/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION served on 10/16/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/18/2017) (znmw). Modified date of service on 10/18/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-11-087NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-11-158Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-16MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to the complaint shall now be due by December 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/16/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/18/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-12-159Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-18MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to the complaint shall now be due by January 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/18/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2018-01-1810MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-01-18MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to the complaint shall now be due by January 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/18/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-01-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/25/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-2511Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-29MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to the complaint shall now be due by February 1, 2018. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/29/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/1/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-0112Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-08MINUTE ORDER: The Court adopts all the deadlines as set forth in 12 the parties' Joint Status Report. Defendant shall file a Vaughn index by April 12, 2018. The parties shall file a further joint status report by May 10, 2018 updating the Court on the status of production and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/8/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-05-1013Joint STATUS REPORT by AQUALLIANCE. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER: In light of 13 the parties' joint status report, the summary judgment briefing schedule shall be as follows: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due by June 7, 2018; Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due by June 28, 2018; Defendant's combined opposition and reply shall be due by July 12, 2018; Plaintiff's reply shall be due by July 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/14/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 6/7/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/28/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/12/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 7/23/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-06-0514Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment, by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-06MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. The following briefing schedule shall now apply: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall now be due by July 6, 2018; Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion shall now be due by July 27, 2018; Defendant's combined opposition and reply shall be due by August 10, 2018; and Plaintiff's reply shall be due by August 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/6/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 7/6/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/27/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/10/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 8/24/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-0615ERRATA by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Renewed Consent Motion for an Extension of Time, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-07-0316MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgment by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) Modified on 7/5/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-06VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER ENTERED 8/8/2018....MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. The following briefing schedule shall now apply: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall now be due by August 6, 2018; Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due by August 27, 2018; Defendant's combined opposition and reply shall be due by September 10, 2018; and Plaintiff's reply shall be due by September 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/6/2018. (lccrc2) Modified on 8/8/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 8/6/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/27/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/10/2018. Replies due by 9/24/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-08-0617MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgment by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-08MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time and vacating scheduling order entered July 6, 2018. The following briefing schedule shall now apply: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due by September 6, 2018; Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due by September 27, 2018; Defendant's combined opposition and reply shall be due by October 10, 2018; and Plaintiff's reply shall be due by October 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/8/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 9/6/2018. Response to and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/27/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/10/2018. Plaintiff's Replies due by 10/24/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-3018Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-31VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER ENTERED ON 11/9/2018.....MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time and vacating scheduling order entered August 8, 2018. The following briefing schedule shall now apply: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due by October 5, 2018; Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due by October 26, 2018; and Defendant's opposition and reply shall be due by November 9, 2018. Any further motions for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/31/2018. (lccrc2) Modified on 11/13/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 10/5/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/26/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/9/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-11-0819Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-09MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 19 joint status report, the summary judgment briefing schedule set by the Court in its 8/31/2018 order is hereby vacated. The parties shall file an updated joint status report on or before November 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/9/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar