Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02115
Date Filed2017-10-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning adoption of Policy Directive 17-1 in response to potential abuse of Civil Asset Forfeiture by federal, state, and local law enforcement. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Judicial Watch that it had been referred to the appropriate components for response. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5156565) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Justice)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-122LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-12Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (sth) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(sth) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-314RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/23/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/22/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/23/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. served on 10/31/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-145NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff