Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAudubon Society of Portland et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2017cv01614
Date Filed2017-10-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Marco A. Hernandez
PlaintiffAudubon Society of Portland an Oregon non-profit corporation
PlaintiffOregon Wild an Oregon non-profit corporation
PlaintiffWaterwatch of Oregon an Oregon non-profit corporation
DefendantU.S. Department of the Interior a department of the United States Executive Branch
DefendantOffice of the Solicitor an office within the U.S. Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-121Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5184682 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Audubon Society of Portland, Oregon Wild, Waterwatch of Oregon against Office of the Solicitor, U.S. Department of the Interior (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Proposed Summons). (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-132Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 2/12/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/12/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 3/12/2018. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (joha) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-133Summons Issued Electronically as to Office of the Solicitor, U.S. Department of the Interior. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-164Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff