Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02120
Date Filed2017-10-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the FBI for records concerning communications between former FBI director James Comey and former Attorney General Loretta Lynch concerning the FBI's investigation of Hillary Clinton's use of a private email server. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5157921) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of Justice)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-132LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-13Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-314RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/23/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/22/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/23/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/23/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff