Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02125
Date Filed2017-10-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Democracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Management and Budget for records concerning potential conflicts of interest pertaining to Joseph Grogan, Associate Director of Health Programs at OMB, particularly whether Grogan had received a waiver of the two-year lobbying restriction. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Democracy Forward Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Defendant2255
OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
725 17th Street, NW, DC 20503
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-131COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5159033). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Summons to Office of Management and Budget, # 4 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 5 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perryman, Skye) Modified on 10/18/2017 (sth). (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-13Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (sth) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(sth) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-203GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/20/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-274NOTICE of Errata by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION re 1 Cover Sheet,, Complaint,, Request for Summons to Issue, (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Complaint)(Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-11-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/3/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/3/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/3/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 11/3/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Concerning Proof of Service)(Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-12-016NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-017Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-04MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 12/26/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/4/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-208Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-21MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 1/6/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/21/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2018-01-169ANSWER to 1 Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Shoaibi, Alexander) Modified to add link on 1/17/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-16MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 1/30/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/16/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-02-0210Joint MOTION for Leave to File Joint Status Report Out of Time by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-05MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to File Joint Status Report Out of Time. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/5/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-0511Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-06MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that that the parties shall file a further status report on or before 4/20/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/6/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-04-1612NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Karianne Melissa Jones on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION Substituting for attorney Skye L. Perryman (Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-2013Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-24MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 5/4/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/24/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-0414Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-08MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 6/1/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/08/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-06-0415MOTION for Extension of Time to Nunc Pro Tunc to file Joint Status Report by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-05MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report, nunc pro tunc. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties joint status report is due on or before 6/18/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/05/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-1816Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-18MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before 8/31/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/18/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-07-2317NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET Substituting for attorney Alexander Shoaibi (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-08-3118Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-05MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 9/28/2018, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/5/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/28/2018 (tj) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-2819Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-14MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 10/26/2018, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/14/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/14/2018)
2018-10-1620SUPERSEDING GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. This Order supersedes this Court's prior 3 General Order and Guidelines for Civil Cases. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these amended directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/16/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-16MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 19 Joint Status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 10/26/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/16/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-2621Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-31MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 11/16/2018, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/31/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar