Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKuntz v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictDistrict of North Dakota
CityWestern
Case Number1:2017cv00223
Date Filed2017-10-17
Date Closed2018-07-11
JudgeMagistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr
PlaintiffRiley S. Kuntz
Case DescriptionRiley Kuntz submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning authorization for the agency to search for records on any North Dakota Driver License or non-license picture upon request by any agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Kuntz that it could find no records. Kuntz filed an administrative appeal, which was denied. He then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [16]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-171COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice (Filing fee $400, receipt number 118000078) filed by Riley S. Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Mailing Envelope)(cd) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-172Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cd) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-173NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Riley S. Kuntz. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/31/2017. (cd) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-234CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Riley S. Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(rh) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-11-155MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. Department of Justice. (Iversen, Tara) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-156CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by U.S. Department of Justice. (cjs) Distributed on 11/15/2017 (cjs). (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-167ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. U.S. Department of Justice answer due by 12/20/2017. (ZE) Distributed on 11/16/2017. (rh) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-12-198SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Department of Justice (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-199MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by U.S. Department of Justice. (Iversen, Tara) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-1910MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Iversen-Kuntz Email Chain, # 2 Attachment A to Exhibit 1: Memorandum of Understanding between the FBI, Criminal Justice Information Services Division and the North Dakota Attorney General, Bureau of Criminal Investigation: Concerning the Search of Probe Photos Against the North Dakota Attorney General of Criminal Investigation Photo Repository)(Iversen, Tara) Modified on 12/20/2017 to clarify docket text(cjs). (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-2711RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Riley S. Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Riley S. Kuntz, # 2 Mailing Envelope)(cd) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2018-01-0812REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Sagsveen Letter to Kuntz)(Iversen, Tara) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-2913MOTION for Summary Judgment by Riley S. Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(cd) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-1614RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Iversen, Tara) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-03-3015Letter from Riley Kuntz (Attachments: # 1 Response Sent by Clerk's Office) (kmk) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-07-1116ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 13 Motion for Summary Judgment. (BG) Distributed on 7/11/2018 (cjs). (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-1117CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of U.S. Department of Justice against Riley S. Kuntz.(cjs) Distributed on 7/11/2018 (cjs). (Entered: 07/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar