Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLIS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01959
Date Filed2017-10-24
Date Closed2019-03-29
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffCALLEN WILLIS
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [24]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-24Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/24/2017. (zsb) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-241COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by CALLEN WILLIS. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits) (zsb) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-242MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CALLEN WILLIS (zsb) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-243NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CALLEN WILLIS. Case related to Case No. 16-1092, 17-1742, 17-2038. (zsb) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-244MOTION to Compel by CALLEN WILLIS (zsb) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-12-045ORDER denying 4 Motion to Compel WITHOUT PREJUDICE; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/30/2017. (zsb) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-04Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-066SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/14/17., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/14/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/13/2018.) (td) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-188MOTION to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index by CALLEN WILLIS; "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson (td) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-219GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/21/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-21ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 1/11/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/21/2017. (lckbj1) Modified on 12/22/2017 (jf). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-22NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry re MINUTE ORDER filed 12/21/2017 was entered in error and will be refiled in correct case.(jf) Modified on 12/26/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-1610ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-02-02MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to compel preparation of a Vaughn Index 8 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs motion is premature, and ordinarily the Court requires submission of a Vaughn Index only after an agency completes its search and in conjunction with the briefing of dispositive motions on any withholdings. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer and by February 28, 2018, shall file a joint report and proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/1/18. (ms) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/28/2018. (gdf) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-2811Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-05MINUTE ORDER: On consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report and Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by May 1, 2018; plaintiff shall file her opposition and cross-motion, if any, by June 1, 2018; defendant shall file its reply and opposition by June 22, 2018; plaintiff shall file her reply by July 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/5/18. (ms) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 6/1/2018. Response to Cross Motions due by 6/22/2018. Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/13/2018. Summary Judgment motions due by 5/1/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/1/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/22/2018. (gdf) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-05-0112First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-1613Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-2414MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-2915MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Hardy Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A to X to Hardy Declaration)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-31MINUTE ORDER: The defendant's 12 13 14 motions for extensions of time are hereby granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/31/18. (ms) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-3116Order advising plaintiff to respond to the 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment and cross motion due by 6/29/2018. Defendant's reply and opposition to cross-motion due by 7/20/18 and plaintiff shall file her reply to the cross-motion by 8/10/18. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/31/18. (ms) Modified on 5/31/2018, to add additional deadlines. (zgdf). (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motions due by 6/29/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Cross Motions due by 7/20/2018. Reply to Cross Motions due by 8/10/2018. (gdf) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-08-0117Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CALLEN WILLIS. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/01/2018 (jf) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-0118MOTION to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index by CALLEN WILLIS. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/01/2018 (jf) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-1319REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-1320Memorandum in opposition to re 18 MOTION to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-1322RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 16 Order dated 05/31/2018 filed by CALLEN WILLIS. (jf) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-1421Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CALLEN WILLIS. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/14/2015 (jf) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2019-03-2923ORDER granting Defendant's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Compel. Memorandum Opinion to be issued shortly, absent unforeseen circumstances. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/29/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-05-1624MEMORANDUM OPINION granting Defendant's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Compel, as stated in this Court's 23 Order of 3/29/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/16/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar