Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02246
Date Filed2017-10-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning diplomatic communications with Mexico pertaining to the building of a wall or barrier along the U.S.-Mexican border. The agency acknowledged American Oversight's request. American Oversight submitted a second FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning efforts to get Mexico to pay for the wall. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-311COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5183119) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-10-312LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-10-31Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (md) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-094RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/7/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/7/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/7/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/7/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-12-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 12/1/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-076ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Request F-2017-12874, # 2 Exhibit Request F-2017-14831)(Westmoreland, Rachael) Modified to add link on 12/8/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-087MOTION for Scheduling Order by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-11MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. It is the Court's standard practice after the defendant has answered in a FOIA case to order the defendant to file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, within approximately one month. Given the parties' mutual interest in conferring about these issues, the Court will order them to submit a joint report on the status of the production, along with a proposed schedule for further proceedings, if any, by January 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/11/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-11MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 7 plaintiff's Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/11/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2018-01-318Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Westmoreland, Rachael) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-02MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must make an initial production of responsive records by March 7, 2018. Thereafter, defendant must make productions on the 7th day of each month until the FOIA productions are complete. The parties must file a joint status report by March 15, 2018, which should indicate the number of records that remain to be reviewed and the time frame in which defendant will complete the review of the records. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/02/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-03-139Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Westmoreland, Rachael) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-15MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties must file a joint status report by March 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/15/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-2210Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Westmoreland, Rachael) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-23MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file a joint status report by May 4, 2018, which should a include a proposed briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/23/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-05-0411Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-07MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file a joint status report by June 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/07/2018. (lcabj3) Modified on 5/7/2018 (tb). (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-06-1812Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-19MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit a joint status report by August 9, 2018, which should include a proposed schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 06/19/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-08-0913Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-10MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit an updated status report by August 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/10/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-2314Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-24MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit an updated status report by September 28, 2018, if the matter has not been resolved by then. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/24/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-09-2715Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-28MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit an updated joint status report by October 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/28/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-3016NOTICE of Change of Address by Rachael Lynn Westmoreland (Westmoreland, Rachael) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-3017Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Westmoreland, Rachael) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-07MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file an updated status report by November 29, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/07/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar