Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02274
Date Filed2017-11-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Privacy Information Center submitted a FOIA request to the National Security Division of the Department of Justice for records concerning reports required by the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court pertaining to FBI queries of Section 702 acquired data on U.S. persons for non-intelligence purposes. NSD disclosed a single heavily redacted document, claiming the redactions were made under Exemption 1 (national security) and Exemption 3 (other statutes). EPIC filed an administrative appeal with the Office of Information Policy. OIP denied EPIC's appeal and EPIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE National Security Division
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5186043) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, National Security Division)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-012LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-013NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-01Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (jd) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-074SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff