Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMorgan v. Berryhill
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv02227
Date Filed2017-11-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Larry Alan Burns
PlaintiffTravis Morgan
DefendantNancy Berryhill Acting Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [6]
Opinion/Order [8]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-011COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill, IFP Filed, filed by Travis Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-2227-LAB-KSC. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Travis Morgan)(rmc) (sjt). (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-012MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Travis Morgan. (rmc) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-013MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Travis Morgan. (rmc) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-014TEXT ORDER OF REFERRAL: All matters arising out of this social security appeal, including the motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and request for appointment of counsel are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for a Report and Recommendation. The parties are instructed to contact Magistrate Judge Crawford's chambers with respect to all scheduling, hearings, or other issues. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/1/17. (no document attached) (rls) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-275ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must sign the Affidavit, make sure the information he provided on pages 1 through 5 of the Application are current, and then re-submit his completed Application within 20 days of the date this Order is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 11/27/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-276ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 11/27/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-12-017MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Travis Morgan. (jdt) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-0112Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford Accepting Document: Motion to Strike Document, from Plaintiff Travis Morgan. Non-compliance with local rule(s): Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion; Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document; OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.2 Missing proof of service. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/8/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/13/2017) (jdt). (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-078ORDER Granting 7 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/7/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-089Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jdt) Modified on 12/11/2017 to remove IFP letter; no marshal service was ordered (jdt). (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-0810Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford Accepting Document: Motion to File New Exhibit, from Plaintiff Travis Morgan. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion; Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document; OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.2 Missing proof of service. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/1/2017. Signed by the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/8/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-0811MOTION to File New Exhibit by Travis Morgan. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/1/2017. (jdt) (Main Document 11 replaced on 12/8/2017; regenerated NEF) (jdt). (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-0813MOTION to Strike Document, by Travis Morgan. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/1/2017 (jdt) Modified to correct event title on 12/11/2017 (jdt). (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2018-01-1114SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Morgan. Nancy Berryhill served. (jdt) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-02-2315Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford Accepting Document: Motion to Amend, from Plaintiff Travis Morgan. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ L. Rule 5.2: Missing proof of service, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 2/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/23/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-2316MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint, by Travis Morgan. Nunc Pro Tunc 2/14/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-0517MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Travis Morgan. (jdt) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-2918ORDER granting 11 Motion to File New Exhibit; granting 16 Motion to File Amended Complaint; denying 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/29/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-3019Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting Document: Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Seal, from Plaintiff Travis Morgan. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 4/17/2018. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/30/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-3020MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document re 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Travis Morgan. Nunc Pro Tunc 4/17/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt) Modified on 4/30/2018 to add Nunc Pro Tunc date (jdt). (jjg). (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-3021MOTION for Summary Judgment by Travis Morgan. Nunc Pro Tunc 4/17/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-0922Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by the Chambers of Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting Document: Notice of Defendant's Deceptive Actions & Request Enforcement, from Plaintiff Travis Morgan. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/8/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-0923Notice of Defendant's Deceptive Actions and Request Enforcement by Travis Morgan. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/8/2018. (rmc) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-1724NOTICE of Failure to Serve by Nancy Berryhill (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party Nancy Berryhill (pty:dft) (jdt). (Entered: 05/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff