Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCLEMENT v. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02451
Date Filed2017-11-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJOEL CLEMENT
Case DescriptionJoel Clement, a former DOI employee who was reassigned, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning its reassignment decisions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Clement submitted a second FOIA request to the agency for records regarding the political affiliation of a number of named individuals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the second request as well. Clement had contacts with the agency concerning its progress, but after hearing nothing further, Clement filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-141COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5203477) filed by Joel Clement. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Atkinson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-14Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsth) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-142SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-173REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Corrected version of summons re 1 Complaint, 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA filed by JOEL CLEMENT. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by JOEL CLEMENT, 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA.(Atkinson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-274NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-285REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Corrected versions of summons re 1 Complaint filed by JOEL CLEMENT. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by JOEL CLEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Atkinson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-296SUMMONS (3) Reissued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-117NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Naylor on behalf of JOEL CLEMENT (Naylor, Lauren) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-118RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General on 11/30/2017. (Naylor, Lauren) Modified party served and date of service on 12/12/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-119RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/30/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/31/2017. (Naylor, Lauren) Modified dates on 12/12/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-1110RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOEL CLEMENT served on 12/1/2017 (Naylor, Lauren) Modified date of service on 12/12/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/31/2017. (znmw) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-1911Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-22MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by January 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/22/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/16/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-1612ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR.(Taaffe, Damon) Modified to add link on 1/17/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-29MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by February 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/29/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/13/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-1313Joint STATUS REPORT by JOEL CLEMENT. (Atkinson, Katherine) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-04-0314NOTICE of Appearance by Sherri L. Morgan on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-05-1415Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 15 joint status report, it is ORDERED that a status conference is set for May 22, 2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/16/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-16Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/22/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-18Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/22/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff