Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSAN MARTIN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02460
Date Filed2017-11-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffANTONIO SAN MARTIN, JR.
Case DescriptionAntonio San Martin, an employee of FEMA, submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Emergency Management Agency for records about himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. San Martin contacted the agency concerning the status of his request and was told it was still pending. After hearing nothing further from the agency, San Martin filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantFEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-151COMPLAINT against FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616088097) filed by ANTONIO SAN MARTIN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-15SUMMONS (4) Issued as to FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-172AFFIDAVIT re 1 Complaint by ANTONIO SAN MARTIN. (jf) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-21MINUTE ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to reissue the correct summonses in this FOIA matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/21/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-293SUMMONS (4) Issued as to FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-044NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-045CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY re 4 Notice of Appearance . (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-186ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-187ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before January 8, 2018. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/18/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2018-01-088Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-09MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit another Report no later than April 9, 2018, which updates the court on Defendant's search and production efforts. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/09/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-09Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-169MOTION for CM/ECF Password by ANTONIO SAN MARTIN (zrdj) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-24MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 9 Motion for CM/ECF Password. Plaintiff's Motion does not satisfy the requirements of Local Civil Rule 5.4(b)(2). To cure these deficiencies, Plaintiff may file a subsequent Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password in which he "confirm[s] the capacity to file documents and receive filings electronically on a regular basis" and "certif[ies] that he either has successfully completed the entire Clerk's Office on-line tutorial or has been permitted to file electronically in other federal courts." The Clerk's Office on-line tutorial may be accessed at http://media.dcd.uscourts.gov/ecf2d/. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/24/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-04-0910STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-10MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report no later than May 18, 2018, updating the court on their efforts to resolve their outstanding FOIA disputes. In the event the parties are unable to resolve their differences, the summary judgment briefing schedule shall be as follows: (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than June 29, 2018; (2) Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than July 29, 2018; (3) Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than August 29, 2018; (4) Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before September 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/10/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-10Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2018. Defendant's Summary Judgment motionsdue by 6/29/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/29/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/29/2018. Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 7/29/2018. Response to Cross Motion due by 8/29/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/29/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-05-1811Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-21MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before July 17, 2018, addressing whether the parties have resolved all outstanding issues and, if not, proposing an amended briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/21/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff