Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNichols Kaster, PLLP et al v. U.S. Department of Labor
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2017cv05179
Date Filed2017-11-21
Date Closed2018-02-05
JudgeJudge Patrick J. Schiltz
PlaintiffNichols Kaster, PLLP
PlaintiffCohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firms of Nichols Kaster, PLLP, and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC filed FOIA requests with the Department of Labor for records concerning home care service workers. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and contacted the law firms once to discuss the request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the two law firms filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Labor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-211COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Labor (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5827304) filed by Nichols Kaster, PLLP, Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Krause, Lindsey) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-212TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 17-cv-5179 PJS/KMM. (kt) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-213Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Labor. (kt) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-12-204DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED//AFFIDAVIT of Service by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Nichols Kaster, PLLP re 1 Complaint, 2 Notice of Initial Case Assignment, 3 Summons Issued (Krause, Lindsey) Modified text on 12/21/2017 (ACH). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2018-01-085SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nichols Kaster, PLLP, Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC. U.S. Department of Labor served on 11/28/2017, answer due 12/19/2017. (Krause, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-086SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nichols Kaster, PLLP, Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC. U.S. Department of Labor served on 12/20/2017, answer due 1/10/2018. (Krause, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-087SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nichols Kaster, PLLP, Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC. U.S. Department of Justice served on 12/20/2017, answer due 1/10/2018. (Krause, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-088NOTICE of Appearance by David W Fuller on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. (Fuller, David) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-129REQUEST for Extension of Time by U.S. Department of Labor. (Fuller, David) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-1210PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request for Extension of Time 9 Request. (Fuller, David) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-1611ORDER that the time within which the Defendant must respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to February 2, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/16/18. (kt) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-02-0212NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Nichols Kaster, PLLP (Krause, Lindsey) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff