Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCarlson v. United States Postal Service
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2017cv06753
Date Filed2017-11-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffDouglas F. Carlson
Case DescriptionDouglas Carlson submitted 13 FOIA requests to the U.S. Postal Service for a variety of records about postal operations. The agency failed to respond to some and withheld records as to other requests. Dissatisfied with all the responses he had received, Carson, after filing administrative appeals for all the requests, filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUnited States Postal Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-221COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #34611129252). Filed byDouglas F. Carlson. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt)(tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-222Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-223Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2018 01:30 PM in Ronald Dellums Federal Building, Oakland. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-275SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas F. Carlson. United States Postal Service served on 11/24/2017, answer due 1/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-11-294STIPULATION extending deadline to respond to complaint filed by United States Postal Service and Douglas F. Carlson. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 11/29/2017) Modified on 11/29/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-046CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Douglas F. Carlson. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-057CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Postal Service.. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 12/5/2017) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-278CLERK'S NOTICE : The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2018-01-109ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Postal Service. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 1/10/2018) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-2210ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continue Deadlines due to Government Shutdown filed by United States Postal Service. Responses due by 1/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Claire T Cormier, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 1/22/2018) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-2511NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 1/25/2018) Modified on 1/25/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-2912ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, February 15, 2018, at 2:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-3113First AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service. Filed by Douglas F. Carlson. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-0114ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference set for February 15, 2018, has been RESCHEDULED TO February 12, 2018, at 10:30 AM Pacific time. New call-in information was provided to the parties. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-0615JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Postal Service. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 2/6/2018) Modified on 2/7/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-0916ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 10 Administrative Motion continue deadlines in light of government shutdown in light of the government's reopening. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-1317ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 2/12/2018 by Tamara Lange. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-1318ANSWER to Amended Complaint byUnited States Postal Service. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 2/13/2018) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-2019Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/20/2018. Matter referred for settlement. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2018 01:30 PM.FTR Time: 1:31-1:39. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/20/2018) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-21CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-2620ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 6/4/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/26/18. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff