Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGILLON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02529
Date Filed2017-11-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffSTEVEN MICHAEL GILLON Dr.
Case DescriptionSteven Gillon, a history professor at the University of Oklahoma who is writing a biography of John F. Kennedy, Jr., submitted FOIA requests to the U.S. Secret Service, the FBI, and the Department of State for records concerning John F. Kennedy, Jr. All three agencies told Gillon that they found no responsive records. Gillon also made a FOIA request to the Secret Service for records pertaining to three deceased Secret Service agents who worked at the White House during the Kennedy administration. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request. Gillon filed an administrative appeal of the FBI's no records decision. The Office of Information Policy told Gillon it had remanded his request to the FBI for further processing. The State Department told Gillon that it could not process the request because it was too vague. Gillon then filed suit against all three agencies.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-221COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5218627) filed by STEVEN MICHAEL GILLON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-27Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-272SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-12-153RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/3/2018. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/04/17. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/4/2017 (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 12/4/2017 (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/1/2017 (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-208NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of All Defendants (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-209Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-21MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' Response shall now be due on or before February 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/21/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to Complaint due by 2/2/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
2018-02-0110Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-02MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 10 Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/02/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to Complaint due by 4/3/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff