Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02596
Date Filed2017-12-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffNATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD
Case DescriptionThe National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's use of mobile biometric devices. The National Immigration Project also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the NIP's request for a fee waiver. The NIP submitted a second FOIA request to the Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties at the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning any civil liberties investigations conducted as the result of the use of mobile biometric devices. CRCL did not acknowledge receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further concerning either of its requests, the National Immigration Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-051COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5233358) filed by NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAG Summons, # 3 Summons ICE Summons, # 4 Summons DHS Summons, # 5 Summons DC USA Summons, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E)(Marshall, C.) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-052Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD. (Marshall, C.) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-05Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (md) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-073SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (md) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-204RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 12/11/2017; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/11/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/8/2017. , RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/8/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/7/2018.) (Marshall, C.) Modified on 12/21/2017 to add service and answer dates (zrdj). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-21NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to ckmarshall@jonesday.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel is reminded to not select All Defendants, each parties must be selected so that service/answer date(s) will show. NO ACTION IS NEEDED (zrdj, ) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2018-01-085ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Nebeker, William) Modified to add link on 1/9/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/08/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff