Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGold Cross EMS, Inc. v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
DistrictSouthern District of Georgia
CityAugusta
Case Number1:2017cv00169
Date Filed2017-12-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge J. Randal Hall
PlaintiffGold Cross EMS, Inc.
Case DescriptionGold Cross EMS submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs concerning its Special Needs Transportation contract. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gold Cross EMS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-051COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, filed by Gold Cross EMS, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-05Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2277399. (jlh) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-052Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs. (jlh) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-053RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/05/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Blank Forms.) (jlh) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-204NOTICE of Filing by Gold Cross EMS, Inc. (Cosper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-225NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W. Blanchard on behalf of U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs. (Blanchard, Jason) Modified on 12/22/2017 (jlh). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-106ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs.(Blanchard, Jason) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff