Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDMOND v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02611
Date Filed2017-12-07
Date Closed2018-11-19
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffJOHN EDMOND
DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
DefendantUNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [15]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-07Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/7/17. (zsth) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE filed by JOHN EDMOND.(zsth) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-072MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOHN EDMOND (zsth) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2018-01-053FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED". Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/5/18. (zsth) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-11Case Reassigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zsth) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-114SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsth) Modified on 1/12/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-02-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/31/18. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/2/2018. (td) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-03-026ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-05-117LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- John Edmond, Reply This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED. no certificate of service." Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/2018. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-188ORDER directing the government to produce a Vaughn Index with a supporting motion to dismiss or motion for summary judgment by 6/21/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/17/18. (lsj) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-06-219First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-2610Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-2811MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Castorina Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A through G to Castorina Declaration)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-1712Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN EDMOND. (tth) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-2713REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-0714ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File and 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/3/18. (lsj) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-11-1915MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 11 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/19/2018. (lcrcl3) Modified on 11/20/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-1916JUDGMENT entered in favor of the Defendants against the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/19/18. (lsj) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar